Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Cölestin (Josef) Cardinal Ganglbauer, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1817Born
25 Aug 184225.0ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
15 Jul 184325.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Saint Benedict
22 Jul 184325.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
23 Mar 188163.5SelectedArchbishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
4 Aug 188163.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
28 Aug 188164.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
10 Nov 188467.2Elevated to Cardinal
10 Jun 188668.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio
14 Dec 188972.3DiedArchbishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

MicroData Summary for Cölestin (Josef) Ganglbauer (VIAF: 80715987)
Cölestin (Josef) Cardinal Ganglbauer O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Wien {Vienna}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceThanstetten, Diocese of Linz
Ordained BishopKremsmünster, Diocese of Linz
Death PlaceArchiepiscopal Palace, Vienna, Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Vienna, Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 8.2 years
  • a cardinal for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 590, and Page 48
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Nov 1884
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1881, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Apr 2017