Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ioánnis Perrís

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Naxos, Andros, Tinos e Mykonos, Greece


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1916Born
23 Mar 194023.4Ordained PriestPriest
24 Oct 196044.0AppointedArchbishop of Naxos, Andros, Tinos e Mykonos, Greece
12 Jan 196144.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Naxos, Andros, Tinos e Mykonos, Greece
29 Apr 199376.5RetiredArchbishop of Naxos, Andros, Tinos e Mykonos, Greece
20 Aug 200689.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Naxos, Andros, Tinos e Mykonos, Greece

MicroData Summary for Ioánnis Perrís
Archbishop Ioánnis Perrís (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Naxos, Andros, Tinos e Mykonos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSyros

  • a priest for 66.4 years
  • a bishop for 45.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Vatican Information Service
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 18 Aug 2018

Quantcast