Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Venedictos Printesis

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Athēnai {Athens}, Greece


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1917Born
23 Mar 194023.1Ordained PriestPriest
15 May 195942.2AppointedArchbishop of Athēnai {Athens}, Greece
15 May 195942.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Thessaloniki, Greece
21 Jun 195942.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Athēnai {Athens}, Greece
27 Sep 196952.6ResignedApostolic Administrator of Thessaloniki, Greece
17 Nov 197255.7ResignedArchbishop of Athēnai {Athens}, Greece
21 Oct 200891.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Athēnai {Athens}, Greece

MicroData Summary for Venedictos Printesis
Archbishop Venedictos Printesis (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Athēnai {Athens}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManna

  • a priest for 68.5 years
  • a bishop for 49.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 54
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)
  • thes: CB, 17 Aug 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 18 Aug 2018

Quantcast