Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Angelo Rotta

Deceased

Official Emeritus of the Secretariat of State

Titular Archbishop of Thebae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1872Born
10 Feb 189522.5Ordained PriestPriest
12 Oct 192250.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thebae
16 Oct 192250.1AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Central America
1 Nov 192250.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thebae
13 Oct 192351.1AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Panama
9 May 192552.7AppointedApostolic Delegate to Turkey
19 Feb 193057.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Hungary
6 Apr 194572.6AppointedOfficial of the Secretariat of State
195784.3RetiredOfficial of the Secretariat of State
1 Feb 196592.4DiedOfficial Emeritus of the Secretariat of State

MicroData Summary for Angelo Rotta
Archbishop Angelo Rotta (born , died ) Official Emeritus of State

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy

  • a priest for 69.9 years
  • a bishop for 42.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 68
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 104, and Page 146, and Page 180
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 193, and Page 227, and Page 255

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.0, 30 Aug 2018; Data: 5 Sep 2018

Quantcast