Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eliseu Van de Weijer, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Paracatu, Minas Gerais

Titular Bishop of Gor


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1880BornHarderwijk, Netherlands
17 Jun 190524.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
25 May 194059.4AppointedPrelate of Paracatu, Brazil
25 May 194059.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Gor
27 Oct 194059.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gor
14 Apr 196281.3RetiredPrelate of Paracatu, Minas Gerais, Brazil
25 Jan 196685.1DiedPrelate Emeritus of Paracatu, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Eliseu Van de Weijer:
Bishop Eliseu Van de Weijer O. Carm. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Paracatu

  • a priest for 60.6 years
  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Sep 2013