Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco de Aquino Correa, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Cuiabá, Mato Grosso, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1885Born
17 Jan 190923.7Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
2 Apr 191429.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cuiabá, Mato Grosso, Brazil
2 Apr 191429.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Prusias ad Hypium
1 Jan 191529.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Prusias ad Hypium
26 Aug 192136.3AppointedArchbishop of Cuiabá, Mato Grosso, Brazil
16 Apr 192237.0InstalledArchbishop of Cuiabá, Mato Grosso, Brazil
22 Mar 195670.9DiedArchbishop of Cuiabá, Mato Grosso, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Aquino Correa
Archbishop Francisco de Aquino Correa S.D.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Cuiabá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCuiabá

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 41.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast