Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Van den Berghe, C.I.C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Budjala, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1907Born
16 Aug 193124.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
9 Feb 194335.7AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Lisala, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
9 Feb 194335.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Boseta
29 Jun 194336.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Boseta
20 Dec 194437.6SucceededVicar Apostolic of Lisala, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
10 Nov 195952.5AppointedBishop of Lisala, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
25 Nov 196457.5AppointedBishop of Budjala, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
24 Jan 197466.7ResignedBishop of Budjala, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
17 May 197669.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Budjala, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for François Van den Berghe
Bishop François Van den Berghe C.I.C.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Budjala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKalmthout

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 32.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1943, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast