Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Edra Ukpo

Archbishop Emeritus of Calabar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1937 BornOkpoma
25 Apr 196527.9Ordained PriestPriest of Ogoja, Nigeria
24 Apr 197133.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ogoja, Nigeria
24 Apr 197133.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Chullu
19 Sep 197134.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chullu
1 Mar 197335.7AppointedBishop of Ogoja, Nigeria
17 Dec 200366.5AppointedArchbishop of Calabar, Nigeria
2 Feb 201375.7RetiredArchbishop of Calabar, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Joseph Edra Ukpo:
Archbishop Joseph Edra Ukpo (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Calabar

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Calabar.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 5 Jul 2014