Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernd Joachim Uhl

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany

Titular Bishop of Malliana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1946 Born
19 May 197427.4Ordained PriestPriest of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
29 Mar 200154.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
29 Mar 200154.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Malliana
1 May 200154.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Malliana
19 Feb 201871.2ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Bernd Joachim Uhl (VIAF: 171485867)
Bishop Bernd Joachim Uhl (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Freiburg im Breisgau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKarlsruhe
Ordained BishopCathedral, Freiburg im Breisgau, Archdiocese of Freiburg im Breisgau

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Freiburg im Breisgau.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Number 13,970
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 19 Feb 2018