Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bl. Teofilius Matulionis

Deceased

Bishop of Kaišiadorys, Lithuania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1873Born
17 Mar 190026.7Ordained PriestPriest
8 Dec 192855.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mohilev, Belarus
8 Dec 192855.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Matrega
9 Feb 192955.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Matrega
9 Jan 194369.5AppointedBishop of Kaišiadorys, Lithuania
9 Feb 196288.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Kaišiadorys, Lithuania
20 Aug 196289.1DiedBishop of Kaišiadorys, Lithuania
25 Jun 2017Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Teofilius Matulionis (VIAF: 50021938)
Archbishop Bl. Teofilius Matulionis (born , died ) Bishop of Kaišiadorys

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKudoriskis

  • a priest for 62.4 years
  • a bishop for 33.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,848
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 Jun 2017