Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vladas Michelevicius

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Kaunas

Titular Bishop of Thapsus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1924BornKaciuniškes
31 Oct 194824.4Ordained PriestPriest of Kaunas, Lithuania
13 Nov 198662.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kaunas, Lithuania
13 Nov 198662.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Thapsus
13 Nov 198662.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilkaviškis, Lithuania
7 Dec 198662.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thapsus
10 Mar 198964.8ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilkaviškis, Lithuania
13 Jul 199975.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Kaunas, Lithuania
12 Nov 200884.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Kaunas, Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Vladas Michelevicius:
Bishop Vladas Michelevicius (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Kaunas

  • a priest for 60.0 years
  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013