Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jakub Walerian Tumanowicz

Deceased

Archbishop of Lviv (Armenian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1714BornStanislawów
1 Jun 177156.9SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
16 Dec 177157.4ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
16 Dec 177157.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Camachus
17 May 177257.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Camachus
11 Jan 178368.5SucceededArchbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
2 Sep 179884.1DiedArchbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Jakub Walerian Tumanowicz:
Archbishop Jakub Walerian Tumanowicz (born , died ) Archbishop of Lviv

  • a bishop for 26.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 142, and Page 260
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,608

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 3 Jan 2014