Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Florian Amand Janowski, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tarnów


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1725BornMaslomiacej
1746²20.6ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
21 Dec 174823.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Saint Benedict
16 Mar 174923.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
22 Feb 178660.8SelectedBishop of Tarnów, Poland
3 Apr 178660.9ConfirmedBishop of Tarnów, Poland
13 Aug 178661.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tarnów, Poland
24 Sep 178661.4InstalledBishop of Tarnów, Poland
4 Jan 180175.6DiedBishop of Tarnów, Poland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Florian Amand Janowski (VIAF: 311278278)
Bishop Florian Amand Janowski O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Tarnów

  • a priest for 51.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 393
  • b: Website of the Diocese, 20 May 2011
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1786, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 25 May 2016