Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ferdynand Onufry Kicki

Deceased

Archbishop of Lviv


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jul 1721³BornGolyminen
14 Mar 175028.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
23 May 175028.8Ordained PriestPriest
15 Dec 177756.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv, Ukraine
15 Dec 177756.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Targa
15 Feb 177856.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Targa
28 Sep 177857.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
25 Oct 178059.2SucceededArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
1 Feb 179775.5DiedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ferdynand Onufry Kicki
Archbishop Ferdynand Onufry Kicki (born , died ) Archbishop of Lviv

  • a priest for 46.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 393, and Page 259
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 454
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,611
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1778, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 25 May 2016