Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciszek Ksawery Zachariasiewicz

Deceased

Bishop of Przemyśl


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1770BornStanislawow
2 Aug 179524.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
9 Aug 179524.6Ordained PriestPriest
23 Sep 183564.8SelectedBishop of Tarnów, Poland
1 Feb 183665.1ConfirmedBishop of Tarnów, Poland
24 Apr 183665.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tarnów, Poland
12 May 183665.4InstalledBishop of Tarnów, Poland
16 Mar 184069.2SelectedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
13 Jul 184069.6ConfirmedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
12 Jun 184574.5DiedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland

MicroData Summary for Franciszek Ksawery Zachariasiewicz:
Bishop Franciszek Ksawery Zachariasiewicz (born , died ) Bishop of Przemyśl

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b: Website of the Diocese, 20 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Number 14,989
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 314, and Page 359

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 11 Jul 2015