Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Kajetan Ignacy Kicki

Deceased

Archbishop of Lviv


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1745¹BornVarsovie
27 Nov 176924.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
10 Dec 176924.9Ordained PriestPriest
18 Jul 178338.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv, Ukraine
18 Jul 178338.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Soli
30 Jan 178540.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Soli
17 Sep 179752.7SelectedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
18 Dec 179752.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
15 Jan 181267.0DiedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Kajetan Ignacy Kicki:
Archbishop Kajetan Ignacy Kicki (born 1745, died ) Archbishop of Lviv

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 259, and Page 383
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 454
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1785, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 15 Jan 2016