Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fidel Mario Tubino Mongilardi

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru

Titular Bishop of Cernitza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1909Born
23 Dec 194434.9Ordained PriestPriest of Lima, Peru
11 Feb 195646.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru
11 Feb 195646.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Cernitza
15 Apr 195646.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cernitza
1 Feb 197363.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru

MicroData Summary for Fidel Mario Tubino Mongilardi
Bishop Fidel Mario Tubino Mongilardi (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima

  • a priest for 28.1 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast