Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Eduardo Picher Peña

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Peru, Military

Titular Archbishop of Abitinae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1920BornLima
23 Sep 194424.1Ordained PriestPriest
3 Aug 196747.0AppointedBishop of Callao, Peru
8 Sep 196747.1Ordained BishopBishop of Callao, Peru
31 May 197150.8AppointedArchbishop of Huancayo, Peru
Jun 197150.8InstalledArchbishop of Huancayo, Peru
14 Jun 198463.8AppointedArchbishop of Peru, Military
14 Jun 198463.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Abitinae
6 Feb 199675.5RetiredArchbishop of Peru, Military
30 Nov 200282.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Peru, Military

MicroData Summary for Eduardo Picher Peña:
Archbishop Eduardo Picher Peña (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Peru, Military

  • a priest for 58.2 years
  • a bishop for 35.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013