Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Germán Schmitz Sauerborn, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lima

Titular Bishop of Megalopolis in Proconsulari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1926BornLima
20 Jul 195832.5Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
17 Aug 197044.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru
17 Aug 197044.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Megalopolis in Proconsulari
18 Oct 197044.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Megalopolis in Proconsulari
28 Nov 199064.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru

MicroData Summary for Germán Schmitz Sauerborn:
Bishop Germán Schmitz Sauerborn M.S.C. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lima

  • a priest for 32.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015