Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Antonio Dammert Bellido

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cajamarca, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1917Born
21 Dec 194629.3Ordained PriestPriest
14 Apr 195840.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru
14 Apr 195840.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Amathus in Palaestina
15 May 195840.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amathus in Palaestina
19 Mar 196244.5AppointedBishop of Cajamarca, Peru
1 Dec 199275.2RetiredBishop of Cajamarca, Peru
10 Sep 200891.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Cajamarca, Peru

MicroData Summary for José Antonio Dammert Bellido
Bishop José Antonio Dammert Bellido (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cajamarca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima

  • a priest for 61.7 years
  • a bishop for 50.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Apr 2017