Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Pao Zin Tou (Tou Pao-zin)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Hsinchu, Taiwan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1911Born
27 Apr 193726.1Ordained PriestPriest
21 Mar 196150.0AppointedBishop of Hsinchu, Taiwan
21 May 196150.1Ordained BishopBishop of Hsinchu, Taiwan
29 Jun 198372.2ResignedBishop of Hsinchu, Taiwan
5 May 198675.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Hsinchu, Taiwan

MicroData Summary for Peter Pao Zin Tou (Tou Pao-zin)
Bishop Peter Pao Zin Tou (Tou Pao-zin) (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Hsinchu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChaohsien
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 49.0 years
  • a bishop for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast