Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerardo Eusebio Sueldo

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago del Estero


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1936BornRosario
9 Jul 196124.9Ordained PriestPriest
30 Apr 198245.7AppointedBishop of Orán, Argentina
3 Jul 198245.9Ordained BishopBishop of Orán, Argentina
15 May 199356.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Santiago del Estero, Argentina
31 Oct 199357.2InstalledCoadjutor Bishop of Santiago del Estero, Argentina
23 Nov 199458.3SucceededBishop of Santiago del Estero, Argentina
4 Sep 199862.0DiedBishop of Santiago del Estero, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Gerardo Eusebio Sueldo:
Bishop Gerardo Eusebio Sueldo (born , died ) Bishop of Santiago del Estero

  • a priest for 37.2 years
  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013