Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Colin Aloysius MacPherson

Deceased

Bishop of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1917Born
23 Mar 194022.6Ordained PriestPriest of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland, Great Britain
2 Dec 196851.3AppointedBishop of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland, Great Britain
6 Feb 196951.5Ordained BishopBishop of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland, Great Britain
24 Mar 199072.6DiedBishop of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Colin Aloysius MacPherson
Bishop Colin Aloysius MacPherson (born , died ) Bishop of Argyll and The Isles

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLochboisdale

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018