Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Clement Tirkey

Bishop of Jalpaiguri, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1947 Born
197830.3Ordained PriestPriest of Darjeeling, India
14 Jun 199749.7IncardinatedPriest of Bagdogra, India
31 Jan 200658.3AppointedBishop of Jalpaiguri, India
23 Apr 200658.6Ordained BishopBishop of Jalpaiguri, India

MicroData Summary for Clement Tirkey
Bishop Clement Tirkey (born ) Bishop of Jalpaiguri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRanput

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jalpaiguri.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Jan 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,139

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast