Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent Aind

Bishop of Bagdogra, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1955 Born
30 Apr 198429.2Ordained PriestPriest of Jalpaiguri, India
7 Apr 201560.1AppointedBishop of Bagdogra, India
14 Jun 201560.3Ordained BishopBishop of Bagdogra, India

MicroData Summary for Vincent Aind
Bishop Vincent Aind (born ) Bishop of Bagdogra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKalchini

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bagdogra.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Apr 2015
  • ob/c2+: CB, 30 Apr 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,507

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.0, 30 Aug 2018; Data: 3 Sep 2018

Quantcast