Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Boghos Bédros (Paul Peter) XIII Terzian

Deceased

Patriarch Emeritus of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1855Born
8 Apr 189236.6AppointedBishop of Adana (Armenian), Turkey
Aug 1892²36.9Ordained BishopBishop of Adana (Armenian), Turkey
23 Apr 191054.6SelectedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
27 Nov 191156.2ConfirmedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
31 May 193175.7ResignedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
15 Dec 193176.2DiedPatriarch Emeritus of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Boghos Bédros (Paul Peter) XIII Terzian
Patriarch Boghos Bédros (Paul Peter) XIII Terzian (born , died ) Patriarch Emeritus of Cilicia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKiutahia

  • a bishop for 39.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 74
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1892, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 May 2017