Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Topuzian

Deceased

Bishop of Musc (Armenian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1855BornBaghgiagik
13 Mar 187923.9Ordained PriestPriest
1 Oct 191156.5AppointedBishop of Musc (Armenian), Armenia
22 Oct 191156.5Ordained BishopBishop of Musc (Armenian), Armenia
Jun 1915²60.1DiedBishop of Musc (Armenian), Armenia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacques Topuzian:
Bishop Jacques Topuzian (born ) Bishop of Musc

  • a priest for 36.2 years
  • a bishop for 3.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 261
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013