Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Taval, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Bishop of Kerema, Papua New Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1956Born
8 Jan 198427.6Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
22 Jun 199943.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rabaul, Papua New Guinea
22 Jun 199943.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Thimida
2 Oct 199943.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thimida
6 Dec 200751.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Kerema, Papua New Guinea
13 Mar 201053.8SucceededBishop of Kerema, Papua New Guinea
29 Apr 201356.9DiedBishop of Kerema, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Patrick Taval
Bishop Patrick Taval M.S.C. (born , died ) Bishop of Kerema

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTaranga

  • a priest for 29.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Dec 2007
  • s: Bollettino, 13 Mar 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,634
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast