Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Onesimo Cadiz Gordoncillo

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Capiz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1935BornJimalalud
18 Mar 196126.1Ordained PriestPriest of Dumaguete, Philippines
14 Mar 197439.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Dumaguete, Philippines
14 Mar 197439.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Gunugus
27 May 197439.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gunugus
3 Jul 197641.4AppointedBishop of Tagbilaran, Philippines
18 Jun 198651.3AppointedArchbishop of Capiz, Philippines
27 Aug 198651.5InstalledArchbishop of Capiz, Philippines
9 Nov 201176.7RetiredArchbishop of Capiz, Philippines
13 Nov 201378.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Capiz, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Onesimo Cadiz Gordoncillo:
Archbishop Onesimo Cadiz Gordoncillo (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Capiz

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 39.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Nov 2011
  • d: CB, 14 Nov 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 6 Dec 2013