Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cosmas Michael Angkur, O.F.M.

Bishop Emeritus of Bogor


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1937 BornLewur
14 Jul 196730.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
10 Jun 199457.4AppointedBishop of Bogor, Indonesia
23 Oct 199457.8Ordained BishopBishop of Bogor, Indonesia
21 Nov 201376.9RetiredBishop of Bogor, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Cosmas Michael Angkur:
Bishop Cosmas Michael Angkur O.F.M. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Bogor

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bogor.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Number 12,480
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 22 Feb 2014