Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Keith Symons

Bishop Emeritus of Palm Beach, Florida, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1932 Born
18 May 195825.5Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA
2 Mar 196835.3IncardinatedPriest of Saint Petersburg, Florida, USA
16 Jan 198148.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Petersburg, Florida, USA
16 Jan 198148.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Sigus
19 Mar 198148.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sigus
4 Oct 198350.9AppointedBishop of Pensacola-Tallahassee, Florida, USA
8 Nov 198351.0InstalledBishop of Pensacola-Tallahassee, Florida, USA
12 Jun 199057.6AppointedBishop of Palm Beach, Florida, USA
31 Jul 199057.7InstalledBishop of Palm Beach, Florida, USA
2 Jun 199865.6ResignedBishop of Palm Beach, Florida, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Keith Symons
Bishop Joseph Keith Symons (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Palm Beach

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChampion, MI

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Palm Beach.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: CB, 17 Aug 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast