Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ivan (Jan Saturnin) Stupnyckyj (Stupnicki)

Deceased

Bishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1816BornSukhorichya
5 Jun 184225.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
9 Jun 184225.6Ordained PriestPriest of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
26 May 187154.6SelectedBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
8 Sep 187255.8ConfirmedBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
20 Oct 187256.0Ordained BishopBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
22 Dec 189074.1DiedBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland

MicroData Summary for Ivan (Jan Saturnin) Stupnyckyj (Stupnicki):
Bishop Ivan (Jan Saturnin) Stupnyckyj (Stupnicki) (born , died ) Bishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • od/op/c0+: CB, 24 Sep 2015
  • bp/ob: CB, 11 Oct 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015