Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gustavo Arturo Help

Bishop of Venado Tuerto, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1946 Born
29 Dec 197226.2Ordained PriestPriest of Lomas de Zamora, Argentina
16 Dec 200054.1AppointedBishop of Venado Tuerto, Argentina
19 Mar 200154.4Ordained BishopBishop of Venado Tuerto, Argentina
24 Mar 200154.4InstalledBishop of Venado Tuerto, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Gustavo Arturo Help
Bishop Gustavo Arturo Help (born ) Bishop of Venado Tuerto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBanfield

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Venado Tuerto.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,943

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast