Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Collar Noguera

Bishop of San Juan Bautista de las Misiones, Paraguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1963 Born
7 Jun 199228.7Ordained PriestPriest of Alto Paraná, Paraguay
23 Apr 201652.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ciudad del Este, Paraguay
23 Apr 201652.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Thamugadi
28 May 201652.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thamugadi
16 Feb 201753.4AppointedBishop of San Juan Bautista de las Misiones, Paraguay
26 Mar 201753.5InstalledBishop of San Juan Bautista de las Misiones, Paraguay

MicroData Summary for Pedro Collar Noguera
Bishop Pedro Collar Noguera (born ) Bishop of San Juan Bautista de las Misiones

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJuan León Mallorquín

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Juan Bautista de las Misiones.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Apr 2016
  • ob: CB, 23 Apr 2016
  • c2+: CB, 17 May 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,925
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Feb 2017
  • i: CB, 16 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Feb 2017