Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Ignacio Wolcan Olano

Bishop of Tacuarembó, Uruguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1953 Born
21 Sep 198632.9Ordained PriestPriest of Mercedes, Uruguay
19 Jun 201864.6AppointedBishop of Tacuarembó, Uruguay
12 Aug 201864.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tacuarembó, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for Pedro Ignacio Wolcan Olano
Bishop Pedro Ignacio Wolcan Olano (born ) Bishop of Tacuarembó

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNueva Helvecia
Ordained BishopSan Fructuoso, Cathedral, Tacuarembó, Diocese of Tacuarembó

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tacuarembó.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Jun 2018
  • ob: CB, 19 Jun 2018
  • c2: CB, 3 Aug 2018
  • c34: CB, 12 Aug 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 12 Aug 2018

Quantcast