Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Son Sam-seok

Bishop of Busan {Pusan}, Korea (South)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1955 Born
6 Feb 198226.2Ordained PriestPriest of Busan {Pusan}, Korea (South)
4 Jun 201054.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Busan {Pusan}, Korea (South)
4 Jun 201054.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Fesseë
9 Jul 201054.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fesseë
10 Apr 201963.4AppointedBishop of Busan {Pusan}, Korea (South)
4 Jun 201963.5InstalledBishop of Busan {Pusan}, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for Joseph Son Sam-seok
Bishop Joseph Son Sam-seok (born ) Bishop of Busan {Pusan}

EventPlace
Birth PlacePusan, Vicariate Apostolic of Taiku
Ordained BishopCathedral, Pusan, Diocese of Busan {Pusan}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Busan {Pusan}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Jun 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,755
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Apr 2019
  • i: AM, 29 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast