Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thaddeus Cho Hwan-Kil

Archbishop of Daegu {Taegu}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1954 BornHwa-Won
19 Mar 198126.4Ordained PriestPriest
23 Mar 200752.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Daegu {Taegu}, Korea (South)
23 Mar 200752.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Abbir Maius
30 Apr 200752.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abbir Maius
4 Nov 201056.0AppointedArchbishop of Daegu {Taegu}, Korea (South)
20 Dec 201056.1InstalledArchbishop of Daegu {Taegu}, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for Thaddeus Cho Hwan-Kil:
Archbishop Thaddeus Cho Hwan-Kil (born ) Archbishop of Daegu {Taegu}

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Daegu {Taegu}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Mar 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,413
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Nov 2010

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013