Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Niccolò Spinelli

Deceased

Bishop of Aversa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1703Born
19 Jan 172723.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
24 Feb 172723.2Ordained PriestPriest
26 Sep 173531.8AppointedBishop of Aversa, Italy
2 Oct 173531.8Ordained BishopBishop of Aversa, Italy
20 Jan 176157.1DiedBishop of Aversa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Niccolò Spinelli
Bishop Filippo Niccolò Spinelli (born , died ) Bishop of Aversa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMurano

  • a priest for 33.9 years
  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1753
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 111
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1735, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast