Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Ignatius Ambrose Giovanni Angelo Porta, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Thermopylae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1767Born
24 Oct 179022.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
8 Jan 182153.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Thermopylae
11 Feb 182153.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thermopylae
25 Aug 183567.6DiedTitular Bishop of Thermopylae

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Ignatius Ambrose Giovanni Angelo Porta
Bishop Giovanni Ignatius Ambrose Giovanni Angelo Porta O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Thermopylae

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCuneo, Italy

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 366
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1821, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast