Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pasquale Giusti

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Caserta, Italy

Titular Bishop of Ascalon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1780³Born
18 Feb 180423.9Ordained PriestPriest
2 Oct 182646.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Caserta, Italy
2 Oct 182646.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Ascalon
12 Nov 182646.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ascalon

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pasquale Giusti
Bishop Pasquale Giusti (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Caserta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMondragone

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 90
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1826, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 25 Jun 2018

Quantcast