Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aloysius Nobuo Soma

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nagoya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1916BornTokyo
18 Mar 196043.7Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jun 196953.0AppointedBishop of Nagoya, Japan
15 Sep 196953.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nagoya, Japan
5 Apr 199376.8RetiredBishop of Nagoya, Japan
6 Oct 199781.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Nagoya, Japan

MicroData Summary for Aloysius Nobuo Soma:
Bishop Aloysius Nobuo Soma (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nagoya

  • a priest for 37.6 years
  • a bishop for 28.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013