Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Kazuhiro Mori

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Tōkyō

Titular Bishop of Fata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1938 BornYokohama
25 Mar 196223.3ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
11 Mar 196728.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
197738.1IncardinatedPriest of Tōkyō, Japan
3 Dec 198446.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tōkyō, Japan
3 Dec 198446.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Fata
23 Feb 198546.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fata
10 May 200061.4ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Tōkyō, Japan

MicroData Summary for Paul Kazuhiro Mori:
Bishop Paul Kazuhiro Mori (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Tōkyō

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Tōkyō.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013