Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George John Smith

Deceased

Bishop of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1840Born
17 Dec 186424.8Ordained PriestPriest
31 Dec 189252.9AppointedBishop of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland, Great Britain
25 Apr 189353.2Ordained BishopBishop of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland, Great Britain
18 Jan 191877.9DiedBishop of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for George John Smith
Bishop George John Smith (born , died ) Bishop of Argyll and The Isles

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCuttlebrue, Diocese of Aberdeen, Scotland
Ordained BishopSt Colomba's, Pro-Cathderal, Oban, Diocese of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland

  • a priest for 53.0 years
  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 262
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 May 2017