Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop James Augustine Smith

Deceased

Archbishop of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1841Born
31 May 186624.6Ordained PriestPriest
14 Aug 189048.8AppointedBishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain
28 Oct 189049.0Ordained BishopBishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain
30 Aug 190058.8AppointedArchbishop of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain
24 Nov 192887.0DiedArchbishop of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for James Augustine Smith
Archbishop James Augustine Smith (born , died ) Archbishop of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEdinburgh, Archdiocese of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland
Ordained BishopSt. Andre, Cathedral, Dunkeld, Diocese of Dunkeld, Scotland

  • a priest for 62.4 years
  • a bishop for 38.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 101, and Page 254
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 54
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jun 2017