Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hugh MacDonald, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1841Born
21 Sep 186725.8Ordained PriestPriest of Western District, Scotland, Great Britain
15 Aug 187129.7ProfessedPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
14 Aug 189048.7AppointedBishop of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain
23 Oct 189048.9Ordained BishopBishop of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain
29 May 189856.5DiedBishop of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Hugh MacDonald
Bishop Hugh MacDonald C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Aberdeen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBorrodale, Arisaig, Inverness-shire, Vicariate Apostolic of Western District, Scotland
Ordained PriestSt. Cuthbert, Seminary, Ushaw, Durham, County Durham, Diocese of Hexham and Newcastle, England
Ordained BishopSt. Mary of the Assumption, Cathedral, Aberdeen, Aberdeen City, Diocese of Aberdeen, Scotland
Death PlaceSt. Bennet's (Archbishop's House), Edinburgh, Lothian, Archdiocese of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland
Buried Place (Original)St Mary of the Assumption, Cathedral, Aberdeen, Aberdeen City, Diocese of Aberdeen, Scotland

  • a priest for 30.6 years
  • a bishop for 7.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 69
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 70
  • loc: CL, 27 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast