Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Donald Aloysius Mackintosh

Deceased

Coadjutor Archbishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain

Titular Archbishop of Chersonesus in Zechia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1844Born
31 May 187126.4Ordained PriestPriest of Western District, Scotland, Great Britain
11 Jun 191267.4AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
11 Jun 191267.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Chersonesus in Zechia
2 Jul 191267.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Chersonesus in Zechia
8 Oct 191974.7DiedCoadjutor Archbishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Donald Aloysius Mackintosh
Archbishop Donald Aloysius Mackintosh (born , died ) Coadjutor Archbishop of Glasgow

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBohuntin, Roy Bridge, Inverness-shire, Vicariate Apostolic of Western District, Scotland
Ordained PriestSt. Mary, Seminary, Blairs, Aberdeenshire, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, Scotland
Ordained BishopSt. Andrew, Cathedral, Glasgow, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland
Death PlaceBishop's House, Hyndland, Glasgow, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland
Buried Place (Original)St. Peter, Cemetery, Dalbeth, Glasgow, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 45
  • loc: CL, 27 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 8 Apr 2018