Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sithembele Anton Sipuka

Bishop of Umtata, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1960 Born
17 Dec 198828.6Ordained PriestPriest of Queenstown, South Africa
8 Feb 200847.7AppointedBishop of Umtata, South Africa
3 May 200848.0Ordained BishopBishop of Umtata, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Sithembele Anton Sipuka
Bishop Sithembele Anton Sipuka (born ) Bishop of Umtata

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIdutywa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Umtata.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Feb 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,736

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast