Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juvencio Juan Hospital de la Puebla, O. Cart. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Northern Hunan {Hu-Nan Settentrionale}

Titular Bishop of Caunus

Member of Carthusian Order


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1870BornVillaeles de Valdavia, Spain
19 Sep 188616.6ProfessedMember of Order of St. Augustine
20 Sep 188919.6Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of St. Augustine
15 Apr 189424.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
18 Sep 191141.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern Hunan {Hu-Nan Settentrionale}, China
18 Sep 191141.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Caunus
4 Feb 191242.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caunus
Mar 1917³47.0ResignedVicar Apostolic of Northern Hunan {Hu-Nan Settentrionale}, China
29 May 191949.3ProfessedMember of Carthusian Order
4 Oct 195787.6DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Northern Hunan {Hu-Nan Settentrionale}, China

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juvencio Juan Hospital de la Puebla
Bishop Juvencio Juan Hospital de la Puebla O. Cart. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Northern Hunan {Hu-Nan Settentrionale}

  • a priest for 63.4 years
  • a bishop for 45.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 19 Jun 2016