Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Landi Pietra

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Benevento

Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1682BornPiacenza
3 Sep 174159.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
8 Sep 174159.2Ordained PriestPriest
18 Sep 174159.2AppointedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
12 Nov 174159.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
9 Sep 174361.2Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jun 174461.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio
13 Sep 174563.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
17 Jan 175269.5ResignedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
11 Feb 175774.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Benevento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Landi Pietra:
Cardinal Francesco Landi Pietra (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Benevento

  • a priest for 15.4 years
  • a bishop for 15.2 years
  • a cardinal for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Sep 1743
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013