Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Antonio Peronaci

Deceased

Bishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1682³BornSerra San Bruno
10 Aug 170624.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
29 Feb 170826.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 173250.9AppointedBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy
28 Dec 173250.9Ordained BishopBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy
1 Feb 173351.0InstalledBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy
5 Feb 177593.0DiedBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Antonio Peronaci:
Bishop Domenico Antonio Peronaci (born , died ) Bishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum)

  • a priest for 66.9 years
  • a bishop for 42.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1732, Number 41
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 425

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015